This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2022 at 06:07:14 (UTC).

Pitts v. Fifth Third Bank, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Pitts filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Fifth Third Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric F. Melgren and Gwynne E. Birzer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02513

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Pitts

Defendants

Fifth Third Bank, National Association

Primeritus Financial Services, Inc.

JHG Mid-American Services, Inc. doing business as American Collateral Recovery of Kansas City

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony E. LaCroix

Attorney at LaCroix Law Firm, LLC

1600 Genessee, Suite 956

Kansas City, MO 64102

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Mangian

Attorney at Thompson Coburn, LLP - St. Louis

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Allison Spors

Attorney at Thompson Coburn, LLP - St. Louis

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts. (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts - trial to be held in Kansas City. (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David M. Mangian on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as unopposed. Fifth Third Bank, National Association answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/7/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Samantha Pitts upon Fifth Third Bank, National Association served on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/10/2022 (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Samantha Pitts upon Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021 (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#11

(#11) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Allison Spors on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Spors, Allison) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint (attorney) Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) Modified title and motion type on 1/24/2022. (jsh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Samantha Pitts (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/14/2022. (kas) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/14/2022. (kas) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER. On review of the Notice of Settlement #15 , the Court notes this case has been resolved. Counsel shall file a motion to dismiss and submit a proposed order for approval by District Judge Eric F. Melgren, or file other appropriate dismissal documents no later than 4/11/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/8/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Samantha Pitts (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Samantha Pitts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's Third Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the #1 Complaint. Fifth Third Bank, National Association answer due 2/4/2022. Any additional requests will require a conference with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/27/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint (attorney) Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) Modified title and motion type on 1/24/2022. (jsh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Allison Spors on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Spors, Allison) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Fifth Third Bank, National Association's answer due 1/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/7/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Samantha Pitts upon Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021 (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Samantha Pitts upon Fifth Third Bank, National Association served on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/10/2022 (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as unopposed. Fifth Third Bank, National Association answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/7/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David M. Mangian on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Fifth Third Bank, National Association, JHG Mid-American Services, Inc., Primeritus Financial Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts - trial to be held in Kansas City. (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Samantha Pitts. (LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5628369.), filed by Samantha Pitts.(LaCroix, Anthony) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fifth Third Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Mangian