Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:17:14 (UTC).

Pitts v. Downey et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Pitts filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Downey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02317

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob P Pitts

Kankakee, IL 60901

Defendants

Todd Schloendof

Jeremy Most

Chad Kolitwenzew

Michael Downey

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Telephone WRIT issued for Jacob P Pitts on 1/28/2020 at 10:15 AM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 12/27/2019 (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jacob P Pitts.(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

1 #5

Envelope

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Cover Letter

1 #2

Exhibits Part 2

1 #1

Exhibits Part 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacob P Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibits Part 2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Summons, #5 Envelope)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Telephone WRIT issued for Jacob P Pitts on 1/28/2020 at 10:15 AM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/16/2020. A merit review hearing is set for 1/28/2020 at 10:15 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/16/2019. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is MOOT. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jacob P Pitts (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 12/27/2019 (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jacob P Pitts (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/2/2019. Plaintiff has submitted a petition for leave to proceed in this case in forma pauperis #3 . However, Plaintiff has not submitted the second page of this form petition, and therefore, he has not verified, under the penalty for perjury, that the information that he has presented in support of his IFP petition is true and correct. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send another IFP form to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete this form, including the signature page and all other pages, and to re-file it with the Court. Plaintiff should file his amended IFP petition within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. The Court will rule upon Plaintiff's amended IFP petition upon receipt. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jacob P Pitts. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jacob P Pitts.(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacob P Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibits Part 2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Summons, #5 Envelope)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less