This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:38:14 (UTC).

PITTMAN v. PITTMAN

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 PITTMAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against PITTMAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01480

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAD A PITTMAN

CHAD A. PITTMAN

Defendants

MARK A PITTMAN

MARK A. PITTMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan S. Townsend

Attorney at BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS, LLP (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Bradley M. Dick

Attorney at BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS, LLP (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Wayne C. Turner

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Kenneth J. Munson

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Patrick A. Ziepolt

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E - AFF. OF KENNETH J. MUNSON

1 #4

Exhibit D - AFF. OF MARK PITTMAN

1 #3

Exhibit C - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #2

Exhibit B - COMPLAINT

1 #1

Exhibit A - STATE COURT RECORD

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER VACATING HEARING: The parties have notified the Court that they have reached an agreement regarding how to proceed with respect to the disputed issues in the motion to compel [Filing No. 6] that was set for a hearing on July 3, 2019. Therefore, the July 3 discovery hearing is vacated. This matter is set for a telephonic status conference at 3:30 p.m. on July 30, 2019,before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel. The information neededby counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The purpose of this conference is to address any remaining discovery issues and settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/3/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Submission of Signature Requirement re #19 Notice (Other) by MARK A. PITTMAN. (Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Agreed NOTICE Regarding Motion to Compel (Agreed), filed by Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN, re #15 Pretrial Conference - InitialSet Hearings. (Ziepolt, Patrick) Modified on 7/2/2019 (NAD). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Ziepolt on behalf of Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN. (Ziepolt, Patrick) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN, Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN. (Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Case Management Plan at Filing No. 13 is DENIED. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/13/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER ON JUNE 6, 2019, INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Parties appeared in person and by counsel June 6, 2019, for an initial pretrial conference. With respect to the pending motion to compel [Filing No. 6], Plaintiff shall serve a privilege log by June 20, 2019. Counsel shall then meet and confer, preferably in person but at least by telephone, by June 27, 2019, to resolve or narrow the discovery issues in the motion to compel in light of the privilege log and other developments. The parties shall file a notice with the Court by July 1, 2019, regarding whether the motion to compel has been resolved or the extent to which it has been narrowed. If the motion to compel is not resolved, counsel shall appear for a hearing on that motion at 1:30 p.m. July 3, 2019, in Room 238 of the U.S. Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. All persons entering the United States Courthouse must have photo identification. The Court will address the parties' conflicting Case Management Plans by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CHAD A. PITTMAN . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chad's proposed Case Management Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Mark's proposed Case Management Plan)(Townsend, Alan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The Court, on its own motion, vacates the initial pretrial conference set for 11:30 a.m. on May 23, 2019, and resets this initial pretrial conference for 3:30 p.m. on June 6, 2019, in Room 234, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Tim A Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel. All persons entering the United States Courthouse must have photo identification. All requirements in the order originally setting this conference shall remain in effect. [Filing No. 10.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/17/2019.(MGG) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2019 11:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/29/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Intent to Respond to Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff CHAD A. PITTMAN (Townsend, Alan) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Dick on behalf of Plaintiff CHAD A. PITTMAN. (Dick, Bradley) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan S. Townsend on behalf of Plaintiff CHAD A. PITTMAN. (Townsend, Alan) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Compel (Refiling of State Court Motion), filed by Defendant MARK A. PITTMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Boone County Motion to Compel for Sanctions and for Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2 - Boone County Pltf Opposition to Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3 - Boone County Reply in Support of Motion to Compel)(Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne C. Turner on behalf of Defendant MARK A PITTMAN. (Turner, Wayne) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Munson on behalf of Defendant MARK A PITTMAN. (Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF MOTIONS THAT REMAIN PENDINNG IN STATE COURT, filed by Defendant MARK A PITTMAN (Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from BOONE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 06C01-1806-PL-000808, filed by MARK A PITTMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5380664) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STATE COURT RECORD, #2 Exhibit B - COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit C - CIVIL COVER SHEET, #4 Exhibit D - AFF. OF MARK PITTMAN, #5 Exhibit E - AFF. OF KENNETH J. MUNSON)(Munson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY M DICK