Pittman et al v. Chick-Fil-A, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25120058)Document filed by Aneisha Pittman, Susan Ukpere..(Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shamis, Andrew) Modified on 9/29/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chick-Fil-A, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aneisha Pittman, Susan Ukpere..(Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Andrew Shamis to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Shamis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chick-Fil-A, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Victor Marrero. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Gorman on behalf of Chick-Fil-A, Inc...(Gorman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chick-Fil-A, Inc...(Gorman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint with Consent addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Daniel Eric Gorman dated October 11, 2021. Document filed by Chick-Fil-A, Inc...(Gorman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint with Consent addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Daniel Eric Gorman dated October 11, 2021. Defendant's request for an extension of its October 28, 2021, deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is GRANTED. Defendant must answer, move, or respond tothe complaint no later than December 6, 2021. So Ordered. Chick-Fil-A, Inc. answer due 12/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/2021) (js) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chick-Fil-A, Inc. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Rene Dansby. Service was made by Legal Assistant for Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. Document filed by Aneisha Pittman; Susan Ukpere..(Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Christopher J. Kelleher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25224015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Kelleher in Support of Pro Hac Vice admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kelleher, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Christopher J. Kelleher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25224015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Christopher J. Kelleher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/22/2021) (kv) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Lindsey B. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25316143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey Mann In Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mann, Lindsey) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Lindsey B. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25316143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Lindsey B. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above- captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/12/2021) (js) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less