Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2020 at 08:22:00 (UTC).

Pitt v. Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Pitt filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt, Cynthia Bashant and Daniel E. Butcher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00694

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

Referral Judges

Jill L. Burkhardt

Daniel E. Butcher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan A. Pitt

Defendant

Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex M Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Jack B Winters, Jr

Attorney at Law Offices of Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Sarah D. Ball

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Capielo

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Craig McKenzie Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic

225 Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Laura L. Geist

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher for all further Magistrate Judge proceedings. All settlement conference dates set beforeJudge Burkhardt, if any, shall be transferred to the calendar of Judge Butcher. All other dates and deadlines, if any, remain unchanged. The new case number is 20cv694-BAS-DEB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/29/20.(jmo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

13 #1

Proof of Service

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

12 #1

Proof of Service

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

11 #1

Proof of Service Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer with Affirmative Defenses by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

10 #6

Certificate of Service

10 #5

Exhibit A

10 #4

Declaration

10 #3

Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits A to M

10 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

10 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits A to M, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Certificate of Service)(Geist, Laura) (jmo). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Geist, Laura)Attorney Laura L. Geist added to party Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13731843.), filed by Susan A. Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-694-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Tomasevic, Alex)(jxv)(jrd) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher for all further Magistrate Judge proceedings. All settlement conference dates set beforeJudge Burkhardt, if any, shall be transferred to the calendar of Judge Butcher. All other dates and deadlines, if any, remain unchanged. The new case number is 20cv694-BAS-DEB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/29/20.(jmo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer with Affirmative Defenses by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Geist, Laura) (sjt). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits A to M, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Certificate of Service)(Geist, Laura) (jmo). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #8 ). Defendant Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company response to complaint due by 5/25/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/29/20. (jmo) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. (Geist, Laura)Attorney Laura L. Geist added to party Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig McKenzie Nicholas on behalf of Susan A. Pitt (Nicholas, Craig)Attorney Craig McKenzie Nicholas added to party Susan A. Pitt(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan A. Pitt. Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company served. (Tomasevic, Alex) (jmo). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Ball by Sarah D. Ball on behalf of Susan A. Pitt (Ball, Sarah)Attorney Sarah D. Ball added to party Susan A. Pitt(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Capielo by Georg Capielo on behalf of Susan A. Pitt (Capielo, Georg)Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Susan A. Pitt(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Winters by Jack B Winters, Jr on behalf of Susan A. Pitt (Winters, Jack)Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Susan A. Pitt(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13731843.), filed by Susan A. Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-694-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Tomasevic, Alex)(jxv)(jrd) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metropolitian Tower Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Winters, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Dale Ball