This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:28:44 (UTC).

Pitre v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Pitre filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13706

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Pitre

Defendants

The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C. Pellegrin

Attorney at Pellegrin Firm, LLC

3500 N. Hullen St., Suite 17D

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorney

Avery Ann Simmons

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (Charlotte)

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Considering that the Court has been advised that the parties have reached a settlement of all claims in this matter, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed without costs, and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on January 14, 2020.(mp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Simmons, Avery) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.Attorney Avery Ann Simmons added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Simmons, Avery) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (cg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7980458) filed by Stephen Pitre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party Stephen Pitre(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Considering that the Court has been advised that the parties have reached a settlement of all claims in this matter, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in the above-captioned matter are hereby dismissed without costs, and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on January 14, 2020.(mp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Simmons, Avery) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.Attorney Avery Ann Simmons added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Simmons, Avery) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (cg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7980458) filed by Stephen Pitre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party Stephen Pitre(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.