This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 09:28:34 (UTC).

Pitkin et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Pitkin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Pitkin

Thriscilla Pitkin

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law

2504 E 21St St, Suite B

Tulsa, OK 74114-1759

Ben D Baker

Attorney at Red Dirt Legal, PLLC

201 North Broadway Street, Suite 111

Moore, OK 73160

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Lynn Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

William J. Holland

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

100 W. 2Nd St., Suite 1100, Williams Center Tower Ii

Tulsa, ST 1100

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Service of Process

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Return of Service

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeffrey Pitkin, Thriscilla Pitkin (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/17/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/17/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeffrey Pitkin, Thriscilla Pitkin (Koller, A) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Ben D Baker added to party Jeffrey Pitkin(pty:pla), Attorney Ben D Baker added to party Thriscilla Pitkin(pty:pla).] (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/15/2021) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koller, A) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William J. Holland on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney William J. Holland added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Holland, William) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-2108 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2477903) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Jeffrey Pitkin, Thriscilla Pitkin (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Holland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Dickerson