This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2022 at 09:02:19 (UTC).

Pitcher v. Banner Health

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Pitcher filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Banner Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas L Rayes and Roslyn O Silver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00374

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Douglas L Rayes

Roslyn O Silver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy Pitcher

Defendant

Banner Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Nicole Weides

Foster Group Pllc - Mcdowell Rd., Phoenix, 902 W Mcdowell Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Troy Patrick Foster

Attorney at Foster Group PLLC

902 W Mcdowell Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85007

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos B Gutierrez

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Kristy Leah Peters

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 1-3

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Health. (Peters, Kristy) (MYE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20432165. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-374-PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver recused. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-374-PHX-DLR. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/11/22. (MJF) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/14/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Banner Health.(Gutierrez, Carlos) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/1/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/1/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Banner Health.(Gutierrez, Carlos) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' #5 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including 4/1/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/15/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/14/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by Banner Health. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver recused. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-374-PHX-DLR. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/11/22. (MJF) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20432165. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-374-PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banner Health. (Peters, Kristy) (MYE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-000368. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20432165 filed by Banner Health. (Peters, Kristy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-3)(MYE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Banner Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Leah Peters