This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:26:38 (UTC).

Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond A. Jackson and Lawrence R. Leonard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

 

Party Details

Interested Party and Plaintiff

Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC

Defendants

JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE

JTH Tax, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julia Amato Rust

Attorney at Pierce McCoy, PLLC

101 W. Main Street, Suite 101

Norfolk, VA 23510

Jeremy C. Kennedy

Attorney at Pear Sperling Eggan & Daniels, P.C.

24 Frank Lloyd Wright Dr., Suite D-2000

Ann Arbor, MI 48105

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley F. Eckerly

One North Franklin St., Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Peter George Siachos

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani (NJ-NA)

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Julia Kim Whitelock

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Wesley David Allen

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Interested Party Attorney

Jeremy Christopher Kennedy

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

25 #1

Supplement Attachment A

#25

#24

#23

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - All process, pleadings and orders for the underlying State Court mat

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jeremy Christopher Kennedy as to Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/15/21. (tlev, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Christopher Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Amato Rust Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7837735. by Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC. (Rust, Julia) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Amato Rust on behalf of Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC (Rust, Julia) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro hac vice for Peter George Siachos as to JTH Tax, LLC. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/1/21. (tlev, ) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley David Allen on behalf of JTH Tax, LLC (Allen, Wesley) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter George Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Julia K. Whitelock Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7813571. by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment A)(Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement emailed to foreign counsel. (jhie, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Kim Whitelock on behalf of JTH TAX LLC d/b/a LIBERTY TAX SERVICE (Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-10550. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Final Arbitration Order and Award on Parties Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., AAA No. 1-17-0007-4284 (filed Feb. 5, 2021), #3 Exhibit 2 - 2008 Area Developer Agreement dated February 29, 2008, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2007 Area Developer Agreement dated December 31, 2007, #5 Exhibit 4 - Cover Sheet and Demand for Arbitration in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., AAA No. 1-17-0007-4284 (filed Dec. 12, 2021), #6 Exhibit 5 - Complaint in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., No. 2:17cv640 (E.D. Va. filed Dec. 12, 2017), #7 Exhibit 6 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., No. 2:17cv640 (E.D. Va. filed Dec. 12, 2017), #8 Exhibit 7 - Order for Preliminary Injunction Pending Arbitration in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., AAA No. 1-17-0007- 4284 (filed Jan. 19, 2018), #9 Exhibit 8 - Amended Demand in Arbitration in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., AAA No. 1-17-0007-4284 (filed Sept. 23, 2020), #10 Exhibit 9 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Claimants Motion for Summary Judgment in Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC v. JTH Tax, Inc., AAA No. 1-17-0007-4284 (Nov. 25, 2020), #11 Exhibit 10 - Atlantic Marine Constr. Co. v. United States District Court, 571 U.S. 4 (2013), #12 Exhibit 11 - Moore v. Katin-Borland, No. 20-10277, 2020 WL 5531501 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 14, 2020), #13 Exhibit 12 - Browning v. Levy, 283 F.3d 761 (6th Cir. 2002)) (Siachos, Peter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 3/18/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (JMcC) Modified on 3/25/2021 (JMcC). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter George Siachos on behalf of JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service. (Siachos, Peter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Following 3/16/2021 Status Conference. (Hearing re Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 6/3/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 3/16/2021. (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Pitcairn Franchise Development, LLC (Kennedy, Jeremy) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service identifying Corporate Parent Franchise Group, Inc., Other Affiliate B. Riley Financial, Inc. for JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service. (Eckerly, Ashley) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JTH Tax LLC d/b/a/ Liberty Tax Service from 22nd Circuit Court for the County of Washtenaw, case number Case Number 21-000254-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8384304 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): American Arbitration Association, 01-17-0007-4284, Judge Arbitrator Peter Kupelian] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - All process, pleadings and orders for the underlying State Court matter, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal) (Eckerly, Ashley) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/26/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JTH TAX, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Liberty Tax Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy C. Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia Amato Rust