This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2021 at 07:14:13 (UTC).

Aurangzeb Pirzada v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Aurangzeb Pirzada filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07395

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aurangzeb Pirzada

Sierra Madre, CA 91024

Zeb Pirzada

Sierra Madre, CA 91024

Defendants

Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company

David Watson

Deborah Pohlson

Elizabeth Owen

Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ethan D Dettmer

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-2933

Nathaniel L Bach

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

12 #1

DEFENDANT FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JU

12 #12

Main Document

11 #6

Exhibit 6

11 #5

Exhibit 5

11 #4

Exhibit 4

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Order #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 09/17/2021. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#8

(#8) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08 and Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds DEFENDANT FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #10 appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for November 1, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. correcting Request for Judicial Notice, #11 (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC.S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Complaint - (Discovery), #10 filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Order #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 09/17/2021. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Elizabeth Owen, Deborah Pohlson, David Watson., filed by Plaintiff Aurangzeb Pirzada. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 15th, 2021. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 21STCV24828 Receipt No: ACACDC-31988486 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Ethan D Dettmer added to party Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (Finra), A Private Company(pty:dft))(Dettmer, Ethan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel L Bach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ethan D. Dettmer