This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 08:02:51 (UTC).

Pirie v. LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On August 27, 2021, Fredrick Scott Pirie (“Plaintiff), represented by Adam John Kress of Johnson Becker PLLC, filed a product liability lawsuit against LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A, Inc. (“LGEM”) and LG Electronics, Inc., (''LG Korea”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory relief along with prejudgment and post judgement interest and attorneys’ fees for the personal injuries sustained by the Plaintiffs as a result of the use of Defendants’ cell phone. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Minnesota with Judges Michael J. Davis and John F. Docherty. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On or about August 23, 2013, Plaintiff purchased the LG Lucid 2 cell phone (hereafter referred to as the “subject cell phone”) designed, manufactured, produced, tested, studied, inspected, labeled, marketed, advertised, promoted, distributed and sold by the Defendants.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On or about November 22, 2016, the subject cell phone overheated and caught fire while in Plaintiff’s pants pocket.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Due to defective design of the separator in the subject cell, thermal runaway was not prevented. An additional safety feature for many lithium-ion cells is "cell regulation". Regulated cells are a safety feature where the circuitry within the cell prevents over and under voltage, thereby preventing a short circuit of the cell and reducing or eliminating the risk of thermal runaway and explosion. The subject cell lacked any safety circuitry.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of the Defendants’ collective conduct, the Plaintiff in this case has incurred bodily injuries, physical pain, mental anguish, diminished enjoyment of life, and other damages.”

 

The Plaintiff has listed out seven claims for relief. The first claim deals with alleged strict product liability. The second claim deals with alleged negligence on the part of the Defendants with respect to the design, manufacture, market and sale of the subject product. The third claim is for alleged breach of implied warranty of the merchantability with respect to the subject product including the lithium-ion battery within the subject product. The fourth claim is for alleged breach of implied warranty of fitness for a particular purpose.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for damages including punitive damages for injuries, economic loss and pain suffered by the Plaintiff as a result of the use of the subject product along with cost of action, prejudgement and post judgement interest and attorney’s fees or any other relief that the Court deems equitable and just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01936

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Davis

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fredrick Scott Pirie

Defendants

LG Electronics, Inc.

LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam John Kress

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

1 #3

FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint

1 #2

FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8981581) filed by Fredrick Scott Pirie. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint, #3 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint) (Kress, Adam) Modified text on 8/27/2021 (MTP). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-01936 MJD/JFD. (MTP) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8981581) filed by Fredrick Scott Pirie. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint, #3 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint) (Kress, Adam) Modified text on 8/27/2021 (MTP). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam John Kress