This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:29:43 (UTC).

Pippins v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Pippins filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Omar J. Aboulhosn and Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00876

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Omar J. Aboulhosn

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charles Duncan Pippins

Bradford, PA 16701

Respondent

United States of America

Interested Party

Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph F. Adams

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Room 209, 845 5Th Avenue

Huntington, WV 25701

James Matthew Davis

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

P. O. Box 1713

Charleston, WV 25326-1713

Interested Party Attorney

Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.

Attorney at FARRELL FARRELL & FARRELL

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

 

Court Documents

#207

(#207) ORDER denying the #206 MOTION by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to File Under Seal; directing the Clerk to unseal the #206 MOTION to File Under Seal and the attached Affidavit and Exhibits, and to docket the Affidavit and Exhibits as a new docket entry, nunc pro tunc to 1/2/2020, when such was filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 1/3/2020. (cc: Movant; counsel of record) (jsa)

208 #10

Exhibit 10

208 #8

Exhibit 8

208 #7

Exhibit 7

208 #6

Exhibit 6

208 #5

Exhibit 5

208 #4

Exhibit 4

208 #3

Exhibit 3

208 #2

Exhibit 2

208 #1

Exhibit 1

#208

(#208) AFFIDAVIT by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr., filed nunc pro tunc pursuant to the #207 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (jsa) (Modified on 1/3/2020 to remove link to #205 order and add link to #207 order) (mkw). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

206 #1

Affidavit with Exhibits

#206

(#206) MOTION by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to File Under Seal. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit with Exhibits)(Farrell, Joseph) (Modified on 1/3/2020 to unseal this motion, affidavit and exhibits pursuant to the #207 order) (mkw).

#205

(#205) ORDER directing that the United States shall file an Answer to the #202 MOTION by Charles Duncan Pippins to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 by 2/27/2020; Movant may, if he wishes, file a Reply on or before 3/27/2020; further directing court-appointed trial counsel Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to file an affidavit responding to Movant's specific claims of ineffective assistance of counsel by 1/16/2020; the attorney-client privilege, which attaches to the communications between Movant and his former counsel, shall not be deemed automatically waived in any other Federal or State proceeding by virtue of the above-ordered disclosure in this Section 2255 proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 12/11/2019. (cc: Movant; counsel of record; Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.) (jsa)

#203

(#203) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Chambers; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; Defendant; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 3:17-cr-00007-01. (klc) Modified document number on 12/11/2019 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

#1

(#202) MOTION by Charles Duncan Pippins to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 3:17-cr-00007-01. (jsa) Modified document number on 12/11/2019 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) ORDER denying the #206 MOTION by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to File Under Seal; directing the Clerk to unseal the #206 MOTION to File Under Seal and the attached Affidavit and Exhibits, and to docket the Affidavit and Exhibits as a new docket entry, nunc pro tunc to 1/2/2020, when such was filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 1/3/2020. (cc: Movant; counsel of record) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) AFFIDAVIT by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr., filed nunc pro tunc pursuant to the #207 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (jsa) (Modified on 1/3/2020 to remove link to #205 order and add link to #207 order) (mkw). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) MOTION by Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to File Under Seal. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit with Exhibits)(Farrell, Joseph) (Modified on 1/3/2020 to unseal this motion, affidavit and exhibits pursuant to the #207 order) (mkw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) ORDER directing that the United States shall file an Answer to the #202 MOTION by Charles Duncan Pippins to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 by 2/27/2020; Movant may, if he wishes, file a Reply on or before 3/27/2020; further directing court-appointed trial counsel Joseph M. Farrell, Jr. to file an affidavit responding to Movant's specific claims of ineffective assistance of counsel by 1/16/2020; the attorney-client privilege, which attaches to the communications between Movant and his former counsel, shall not be deemed automatically waived in any other Federal or State proceeding by virtue of the above-ordered disclosure in this Section 2255 proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 12/11/2019. (cc: Movant; counsel of record; Joseph M. Farrell, Jr.) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#204) Document nos. 4-204 filed only in criminal case; not applicable to this proceeding. (Modified document number on 12/11/2016 to correspond to companion criminal action. (mkw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2255 MOTION by Charles Duncan Pippins to U. S. Attorney with copy to Movant, Judge, Magistrate Judge. (jsa) Modified document number on 12/11/2019 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Chambers; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; Defendant; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 3:17-cr-00007-01. (klc) Modified document number on 12/11/2019 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) MOTION by Charles Duncan Pippins to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 3:17-cr-00007-01. (jsa) Modified document number on 12/11/2019 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.