This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 09:18:16 (UTC).

Pipkin v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Pipkin against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Pipkin

Defendant

Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lloyd W. Kitchens, III

Attorney at Brad Hendricks Law Firm

500 Pleasant Valley Drive, Suite C

Little Rock, AR 72227

John Holleman

Attorney at Holleman & Associates, P.A.

1008 West 2Nd Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Graham Caughman Talley

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Julia C Barrett

Attorney at King & Spalding

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Jeffrey S Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

J Matthew Brigman

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

Zachary A McEntyre

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

Julia C. Barrett

Attorney at King & Spalding

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

J. Matthew Brigman

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

Zachary A. McEntyre

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30903-3521

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Julia C. Barrett re 10 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Julia C. Barrett. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570226. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zachary A. McEntyre. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570221. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Matthew Brigman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570213. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey S. Cashdan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570207. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#11

(#11) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Caughman Talley on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, filed by Christopher Pipkin. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company from Cleburne County Circuit Court, case number 12cv19-175. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074134. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Julia C. Barrett re 10 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey S. Cashdan; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Matthew Brigman; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary A. McEntyre; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia C. Barrett. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/01/2019. (rmg) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Julia C. Barrett. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570226. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zachary A. McEntyre. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570221. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Matthew Brigman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570213. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey S. Cashdan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3570207. Filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/23/19. (ejy) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Caughman Talley on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, filed by Christopher Pipkin. (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company from Cleburne County Circuit Court, case number 12cv19-175. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074134. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.