This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 08:48:34 (UTC).

Pinson and Tang LLC v. Simplify Compliance, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Pinson and Tang LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Simplify Compliance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03519

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINSON AND TANG LLC

Defendant

SIMPLIFY COMPLIANCE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell T Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Munira Jesani

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Ave, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon T Allen

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1100 Louisiana, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Paige Waldrop Mills

Attorney at Bass Berry et al

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: November/December 2021. ETT: 5 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2020 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/29/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/26/2021. Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/30/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/30/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pinson and Tang LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#16

(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Pinson and Tang LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed.(Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Paige Waldrop Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet CCS

1 #11

Exhibit K - Examples

1 #10

Exhibit J - Webinar Confusion

1 #9

Exhibit Exh I

1 #8

Exhibit H - 2019 Coder's Guide

1 #7

Exhibit G - 2019 CDI Pocket Guide

1 #6

Exhibit F - 2019 Ft Worth 2019 Conference

1 #5

Exhibit E - 2020 Dallas Bootcamps Dec 2020

1 #4

Exhibit D - 2019 ACDIS Symposium Brochure

1 #3

Exhibit C - 2016 Houston Bootcamp

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2015_ACDIS_Conf_Brochure

1 #1

Exhibit A - 2009 Bootcamps Dallas and Houston

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SIMPLIFY COMPLIANCE, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25354199) filed by PINSON AND TANG LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2009 Bootcamps Dallas and Houston, #2 Exhibit B - 2015_ACDIS_Conf_Brochure, #3 Exhibit C - 2016 Houston Bootcamp, #4 Exhibit D - 2019 ACDIS Symposium Brochure, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 Dallas Bootcamps Dec 2020, #6 Exhibit F - 2019 Ft Worth 2019 Conference, #7 Exhibit G - 2019 CDI Pocket Guide, #8 Exhibit H - 2019 Coder's Guide, #9 Exhibit Exh I, #10 Exhibit J - Webinar Confusion, #11 Exhibit K - Examples, #12 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: November/December 2021. ETT: 5 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2020 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/29/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/26/2021. Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/30/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/30/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2020. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: Russell T Wong, Munira Jesani, Paige Waldrop Mills, Brandon T Allen.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pinson and Tang LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Pinson and Tang LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed.(Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Paige Waldrop Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have through and until November 23, 2020, to file its response to this action.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Allen and Chris Reynolds on behalf of Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed. (Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed.(Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Response to Complaint by Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Paige Waldrop Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Simplify Compliance, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2020. (Allen, Brandon) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Simplify Compliance, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Simplify Compliance, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to SIMPLIFY COMPLIANCE, LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PINSON AND TANG LLC, filed.(Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Munira Jesani of Blank Rome LLP on behalf of PINSON AND TANG LLC, filed. (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SIMPLIFY COMPLIANCE, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25354199) filed by PINSON AND TANG LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2009 Bootcamps Dallas and Houston, #2 Exhibit B - 2015_ACDIS_Conf_Brochure, #3 Exhibit C - 2016 Houston Bootcamp, #4 Exhibit D - 2019 ACDIS Symposium Brochure, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 Dallas Bootcamps Dec 2020, #6 Exhibit F - 2019 Ft Worth 2019 Conference, #7 Exhibit G - 2019 CDI Pocket Guide, #8 Exhibit H - 2019 Coder's Guide, #9 Exhibit Exh I, #10 Exhibit J - Webinar Confusion, #11 Exhibit K - Examples, #12 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell T. Wong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Munira A. Jesani