This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:05:48 (UTC).

PINNELL et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 PINNELL filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05738

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEREMY FERNANDEZ

SHANE PERRILLOUX

JERRY PINNELL

Defendants

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

RONIT SATCHI-FAINARO

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30

DR. SOL J. BARER

ROBERTO A. MIGONE

MURRAY A. GOLDBERG

NECHEMIA J. PERES

JEAN-MICHEL HALFON

GERALD M. LIEBERMAN

ROSEMARY A. CRANE

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

DR. PARRY D. NISEN

AMIR ELSTEIN

KARE SCHULTZ

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD R. REAVEY

Attorney at CAPOZZI ADLER PC

2933 North Front St

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN T. ORTELERE

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, filed by BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(ORTELERE, BRIAN) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS NOT APPROVED. PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND UNTIL NO LATER THAN 2/5/2020. SHOULD PLAINTIFFS ELECT NOT TO TIMELY AMEND, THE SERVED DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/7/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/30/2020. 1/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. ORTELERE on behalf of BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE with Certificate of Service(ORTELERE, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by JEREMY FERNANDEZ, SHANE PERRILLOUX, JERRY PINNELL. Waiver of Service due by 1/5/2020. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DR. SOL J. BARER, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ROSEMARY A. CRANE, AMIR ELSTEIN, MURRAY A. GOLDBERG, JEAN-MICHEL HALFON, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30, GERALD M. LIEBERMAN, ROBERTO A. MIGONE, DR. PARRY D. NISEN, NECHEMIA J. PERES, RONIT SATCHI-FAINARO, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207867.), filed by JERRY PINNELL, JEREMY FERNANDEZ, SHANE PERRILLOUX.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, filed by BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE.Certificate of Service.(ORTELERE, BRIAN) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS NOT APPROVED. PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND UNTIL NO LATER THAN 2/5/2020. SHOULD PLAINTIFFS ELECT NOT TO TIMELY AMEND, THE SERVED DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/7/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/30/2020. 1/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. ORTELERE on behalf of BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE with Certificate of Service(ORTELERE, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERRY PINNELL. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (REAVEY, DONALD) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by JEREMY FERNANDEZ, SHANE PERRILLOUX, JERRY PINNELL. Waiver of Service due by 1/5/2020. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JEREMY FERNANDEZ, SHANE PERRILLOUX, JERRY PINNELL. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DR. SOL J. BARER, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ROSEMARY A. CRANE, AMIR ELSTEIN, MURRAY A. GOLDBERG, JEAN-MICHEL HALFON, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30, GERALD M. LIEBERMAN, ROBERTO A. MIGONE, DR. PARRY D. NISEN, NECHEMIA J. PERES, RONIT SATCHI-FAINARO, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. INVESTMENT COMMITTEE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207867.), filed by JERRY PINNELL, JEREMY FERNANDEZ, SHANE PERRILLOUX.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.