This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 08:06:36 (UTC).

Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. v. Stapleton

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stapleton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02057

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.

Defendant

Shawn Stapleton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Frank Margello

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

163 Madison Ave., Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Angie C. Davis

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

First Tennessee Bank Building, 165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Alan G. Crone

Attorney at THE CRONE LAW FIRM, PLC

88 Union Avenue, 4Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38103

Laura Ann Elizabeth Bailey

Attorney at THE CRONE LAW FIRM, PLC

88 Union Ave., 14Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38103

Bailey H. Dorsey

Attorney at THE CRONE LAW FIRM, PLC

88 Union Avenue, 14Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Blair, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting DE #44 and DE #47 Motions for Extension of Time to File Response as to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/11/19. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#47

(#47) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply as to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed Combined Motion) (proposed order submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#46

(#46) NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#44

(#44) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (proposed order submitted), #41 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (proposed order submitted) by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#43

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#42

(#42) NOTICE by Shawn Stapleton re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Exhibits In Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Pinnacle I - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Deposition Pinnacle I - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - Deposition Shawn Stapleton, #4 Exhibit C - Deposition Pinnacle II, #5 Exhibit D.E. 1 - Verified Complaint and Exhibits)(Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#41

(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction filed by Shawn Stapleton. (Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#40

(#40) First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (proposed order submitted) by Shawn Stapleton. (Dorsey, Bailey) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction filed by Shawn Stapleton. (Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Frank Margello on behalf of Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Agriculture Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Agriculture Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Parent Guarantor Corporation, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Operating Corporation, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Intermediate Holdings I Corporation for Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc... (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #5

Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Cease and Desist Letter

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Resignation Letter

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Shawn Stapleton (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2972074), filed by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Blair, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting DE #44 and DE #47 Motions for Extension of Time to File Response as to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/11/19. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Response in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply as to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed Combined Motion) (proposed order submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#45) SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Injunction Hearing RESET for 4/9/2019 AT 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (proposed order submitted), #41 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (proposed order submitted) by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Sealed Document Exhibit D to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE by Shawn Stapleton re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Exhibits In Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Pinnacle I - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Deposition Pinnacle I - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - Deposition Shawn Stapleton, #4 Exhibit C - Deposition Pinnacle II, #5 Exhibit D.E. 1 - Verified Complaint and Exhibits)(Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction filed by Shawn Stapleton. (Bailey, Laura Ann) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (proposed order submitted) by Shawn Stapleton. (Dorsey, Bailey) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Granting #4 Motion for TRO and Notice of Hearing signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 1/23/19. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Shawn Stapleton. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 - Agreement)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Frank Margello on behalf of Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Margello, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Agriculture Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Agriculture Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Parent Guarantor Corporation, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Operating Corporation, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Pinnacle Intermediate Holdings I Corporation for Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc... (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Shawn Stapleton (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2972074), filed by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Please Issue for Private Process Service)(Davis, Angie) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.