This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 07:50:40 (UTC).

Pink Floyd (1987) Limited v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Pink Floyd 1987 Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04969

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pink Floyd (1987) Limited

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

iteeglobal.com

rocktee.net

perfecttouchprinted.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Ste 200

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#26

(#26) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/17/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #23 is granted. Enter Default Final Judgment Order. Any hearing dates or deadlines before this Court are vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

24 #3

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

24 #2

Exhibit 2

24 #1

Exhibit 1

24 #24

Main Document

#23

(#23) MOTION by Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#22

(#22) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Schedule A

1 #1

Main Document

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/17/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #23 is granted. Enter Default Final Judgment Order. Any hearing dates or deadlines before this Court are vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM by Pink Floyd (1987) Limited in support of motion for default judgment #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION by Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: iteeglobal.com, rocktee.net and perfecttouchprinted.com added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2022. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #17 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The preliminary injunction and status hearing set for 9/28/2022 is vacated. The Clerk is directed to unseal all documents that were previously filed under seal. Law Firms Jiangip LLC and Keith Vogt, Ltd. are ordered to add all defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 11/30/2022 at 9:00 AM. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852; access code 746-1053. Plaintiff is directed to file on 11/23/2022 a status report regarding service of and compliance with the preliminary injunction and settlement discussions. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pink Floyd (1987) Limited as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, of Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #17 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/28/2022 at 08:55 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pink Floyd (1987) Limited (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pink Floyd (1987) Limited by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pink Floyd (1987) Limited; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19837303. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINK FLOYD (1987) LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yi Bu