This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2021 at 10:18:48 (UTC).

Pineapple34, LLC v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On March 25, 2021, Pineapple34, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages and a judgement adequate to compensate plaintiff for the alleged unlawful infringement of technology relating to the system and method for performing security functions of a mobile station. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

Plaintiff stated in its complaint that “Plaintiff is the assignee of all right, title and interest in United States Patent Nos. 7,181,252; and 7,822,387 (the “Patents-in-Suit”); including all rights to enforce and prosecute actions for infringement and to collect damages for all relevant times against infringers of the Patents-in-Suit. Accordingly, Plaintiff possesses the exclusive right and standing to prosecute the present action for infringement of the Patents-in-Suit by Defendant.”

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’252 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’252 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’252 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’252 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers”. The defendant has actual knowledge of the infringement and still “continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’252 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’252 Patent”.

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’387 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’387 Patent”.

There are two claims for relief laid down by Pineapple34, LLC. The first claim is for the alleged infringement of ’252 Patent entitled “System and method for performing security functions of a mobile station”. The second claim for the alleged  infringement of ’387 Patent is entitled “Remote monitoring device and process”.

In its prayer for relief, Pineapple34 LLC, has requested the court for accounting of all damages not presented at trial; a judgment that ’252 and ’387 Patents are valid and enforceable; a judgment that Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the Patent-in-suit; a judgment that awards Plaintiff all appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant's continuing or future infringement, up until the date such judgment; is entered with respect to the patents in suit, including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284; and such further relief at law or in equity as the Court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pineapple34, LLC

Defendant

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pineapple34, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pineapple34, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14631558), filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pineapple34, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pineapple34, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14631558), filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pineapple34, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff