This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 08:40:34 (UTC).

Pineapple34, LLC v. HP Inc.

Case Summary

On November 15, 2021, Pineapple34, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against HP Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking disbursement and damages along with pre- or post-judgement interest for the Defendant's alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,181,252 entitled “System and method for performing security functions of a mobile station,” (“the ’252 Patent” or the “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’252 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’252 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’252 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’252 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’252 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products. Despite actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’252 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’252 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’252 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’252 Patent.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff deals with the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-Suit owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for a judgment that Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the ’252 Patent; that the Plaintiff be awarded all appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant's continuing or future infringement, up until the date such judgment is entered with respect to the ’252 Patent, including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284; and that this case be declared exceptional within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and that Plaintiff be awarded its reasonable attorney’s fees along with such further relief at law or in equity as the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01180

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pineapple34, LLC

Defendant

HP Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorneys

Keeley I. Vega

Attorney at Turner Boyd LLP

702 Marshall St., Suite 640

Redwood City, CA 94063

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keeley I. Vega on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Keeley I. Vega added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Vega, Keeley) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant HP Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 1/21/22 by Pineapple34, LLC re #1 Complaint (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to HP Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pineapple34, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15437262), filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keeley I. Vega on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Keeley I. Vega added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Vega, Keeley) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: HP Inc. answer due 1/21/2022. (ir) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant HP Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 1/21/22 by Pineapple34, LLC re #1 Complaint (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to HP Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pineapple34, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15437262), filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pineapple34, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HP, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keeley Irene Vega

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith