This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 10:18:32 (UTC).

Pineapple34, LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On March 25, 2021, Pineapple34, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages with pre-judgment and post-judgment interests among other reliefs, for the alleged unlawful infringement of technology related to System and method for controlling home appliances and various other technologies owned by Plaintiff.  This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the infringement of United States Patent No. 6,980,150 entitled “System and method for controlling home appliances”’ the (150 Patent); United States Patent No. 7,181,252 entitled “System and method for performing security functions of a mobile station,” the (252 Patent); United States Patent No. 7,822,387 entitled “Remote monitoring device and process,” the (387 Patent); United States Patent No. 8,594,076 entitled “Mobile wireless internet portable radio,” the (076 Patent) (collectively “Patents-in-suit”).

The Plaintiff alleged that “Google has directly infringed one or more claims of the Patents-in-Suit in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products (“Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the Patents-in-Suit (the “Exemplary Patents Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the Patents-in-Suit have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its Customers and It is also alleged by the plaintiff that Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary Patents Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the Patents-in-Suit and that it has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end-users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the Patents-in-Suit and that At least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claims.”

In the four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, Infringement of the Patents-in-suit in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 (b) has been claimed, wherein it has been alleged that Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the Patents-in-Suit, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the Patents-in-suit.

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court to pass judgment that all the patents-in-suit are valid and enforceable, Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the patents-in-suit, accounting of all damages not presented at trial; A judgment that awards Plaintiff all appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant's continuing or future infringement, up until the date such judgment is entered with respect to the ’252; and ’387 Patents, including pre-or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with costs of litigation. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pineapple34, LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorneys

G. Blake Thompson

Attorney at Mann Tindel Thompson

201 E. Howard Street

Henderson, TX 75654

Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Bijal V. Vakil

Attorney at White & Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 2 Palo Alto Square, Ste. 900

Palo Alto, CA 94306

J. Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel Thompson

201 E. Howard Street

Henderson, TX 75654

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

#11

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bijal V. Vakil on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Bijal V. Vakil added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 6/5/2021. (lad) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including June 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, G.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney J. Mark Mann added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Mann, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Pineapple34, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14631327), filed by Pineapple34, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pineapple34, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bijal Vijay Vakil