This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2019 at 07:35:13 (UTC).

Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC et al v. Arch Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Arch Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61608

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendants

Arch Insurance Company

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Arch Insurance Company, Inc.

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey David Ittleman

Attorney at Geoffrey D Ittleman PA

440 N Andrews Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Michael O'Brien Colgan

Attorney at Clausen Miller, P.C.

600, 4830 West Kennedy Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

20 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

20 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

20 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

20 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

#20

#19

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed order

#18

#13

4 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

#4

1 #6

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

1 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

1 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

1 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

1 #2

Summon(s) summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for damages and demand for trial by jury against Arch Specialty Insurance Company filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER that Plaintiffs' request for leave to amend (D.E. #18 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs SHALL file the second amended complaint no later than Friday, August 16, 2019. Defendant Arch Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (D.E. #13 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Arch Insurance Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court SHALL TERMINATE Arch Insurance Company as a party defendant to this action and SHALL ADD Arch Specialty Insurance Company as a party defendant to this action. Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 8/30/2019. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (Amended Complaint due by 8/16/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED AGREED ORDER re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Ittleman, Geoffrey) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (vmz). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Striking #15 Notice (Other), filed by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC (Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Notice (Other),. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (vmz) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STRICKEN PER DE #17 NOTICE by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM failure to name indispensable party, failure to state a cause of action, and lack of standing on subject matter jurisdiction proposed agreed order (Ittleman, Geoffrey) Modified on 8/14/2019 (vmz). (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Resetting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION TO DISMISS #4 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM failure to name indispensable party, failure to state a cause of action, and lack of standing on subject matter jurisdiction by Arch Insurance Company, Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colgan, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Reset Answer Due Deadline: Arch Insurance Company, Inc. response due 7/30/2019. (vmz) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Answer Due Deadline: Arch Insurance Company, Inc. response due 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael O'Brien Colgan on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Inc.. Attorney Michael O'Brien Colgan added to party Arch Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft). (Colgan, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Compliance by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC re #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Compliance with court order by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC re #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A) (Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Setting Initial Planning And Scheduling Report, ( Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/26/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Inc. (vmz) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC re #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) proposed summons) (Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) summons, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (pcs) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for damages and demand for trial by jury against Arch Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11767358, filed by Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise, LLC, Pine Island Shopping Plaza at Sunrise II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) summons, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(Ittleman, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Arch Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN