This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:17:00 (UTC).

Pimentel v. Zumiez Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Pimentel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Zumiez Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Allison Claire. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02541

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William B. Shubb

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esmeralda Pimentel

Defendant

Zumiez Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Calvin Chang

Attorney at Law Office Of Calvin Chang

980 - 9Th Street, 16Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron J. Ver

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

David A. Perez, PHV

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Ave, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/10/2020 DISMISSING this action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Esmeralda Pimentel. (Chang, Calvin) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to DISMISS by Zumiez Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

13 #3

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to REMAND by Esmeralda Pimentel. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Chang, Calvin) Modified on 1/16/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

13 #1

Points and Authorities

13 #2

Declaration

#11

(#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/6/2020 REASSIGNING this case to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. All documents hereafter filed with the Clerk shall bear case number 2:19-cv-02541-AC. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Senior Judge William B. Shubb are hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/19. Added attorney David A. Perez, PHV for Zumiez Inc. (Coll, A) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Zumiez Inc. for attorney David A. Perez to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8631247) (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Zumiez Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zumiez Inc. (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/10/2020 DISMISSING this action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Esmeralda Pimentel. (Chang, Calvin) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #9 Motion to Dismiss, SET/RESET MOTION HEARING. Please be advised, in order to maintain efficiency the court finds it necessary to continue the motion to dismiss. Therefore the matter is continued from 2/12/2020 to 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. If the parties have scheduling issues because of this change you should contact the Court Clerk immediately at (916) 930-4199 or VCallen@caed.uscourts.gov. (Callen, V) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to REMAND by Esmeralda Pimentel. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Chang, Calvin) Modified on 1/16/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the #11 Order of Reassignment of this action to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire, the Minute Order (Text Only) entry (Docket No. 10) is VACATED. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/6/2020 REASSIGNING this case to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. All documents hereafter filed with the Clerk shall bear case number 2:19-cv-02541-AC. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Senior Judge William B. Shubb are hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are notified that #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss has been improperly noticed before the Magistrate Judge, and therefore, the 2/12/2020 hearing date is VACATED. Pursuant to Local Rule 230, this motion shall be heard on 2/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Counsel for defendant is instructed to immediately file and serve an amended notice of motion (only) setting forth the above-referenced date and time, or the motion may be stricken. The parties are further instructed to review the Local Rules and Judge Shubb's calendaring information on the court's website for available hearing dates prior to filing any motions. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to DISMISS by Zumiez Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/19. Added attorney David A. Perez, PHV for Zumiez Inc. (Coll, A) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Zumiez Inc. for attorney David A. Perez to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8631247) (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Chang, Calvin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Zumiez Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for WBS. (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zumiez Inc. (Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00268279 by Zumiez Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8627528) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ver, Aaron) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.