This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 08:55:40 (UTC).

Pillow v. Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Pillow filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aholusi Pillow

Defendant

Wellmed Medical Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

J. Russ Bryant

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Turner, IV

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pillow Consent to Join

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/7/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Aholusi Pillow. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for continuance (Docket Entry No. #6 ) is GRANTED and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 7, 2022, to 11:00 a.m., Wednesday, November 16, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. See Docket Entry No. #5 for dialing instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. on 09/03/2022, filed by Aholusi Pillow. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. on 09/03/2022, filed by Aholusi Pillow. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for continuance (Docket Entry No. #6 ) is GRANTED and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 7, 2022, to 11:00 a.m., Wednesday, November 16, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. See Docket Entry No. #5 for dialing instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Aholusi Pillow. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/7/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, and Robert E. Morelli, III admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wellmed Medical Management, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3634426) filed by Aholusi Pillow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pillow Consent to Join, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLMED MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon E. Jackson