This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Piller Power Systems, Inc. v. Jurek

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Piller Power Systems, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jurek. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00793

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Piller Power Systems, Inc.

Defendant

Justin Jurek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank Paul Izzo

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

2649 South Road

Poughkeepsie, NY 12601

Michael Charles Mule

Attorney at Rivkin Radler, LLP

926 Rexcorp Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Kenneth A. Novikoff

Attorney at Rivkin Radler, LLP

926 Rexcorp Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Defendant Attorney

Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

401 Park Avenue South, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Stay. Application granted. This case shall be stayed pending resolution of Piller's motion to dismiss the related action before the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Within one week of the resolution of that motion, the parties shall submit a joint status letter providing the Court with a copy of the decision and proposing next steps in the instant action. The initial pre-trial conference, currently scheduled for February 26, 2021, is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/18/2021) (rj) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#17

(#17) LETTER MOTION to Stay regarding Defendant's letter motion for a stay in this action addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Michael Mule dated February 18, 2021. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER with respect to #14 Letter Motion to Stay. Should Plaintiff oppose the motion to stay proceedings, it shall file a letter no later than February 19, 2021, articulating why the stay should not be granted. Absent a response from Plaintiff by that date, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/16/2021) (rj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#15

(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Piller Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent Langley Holdings plc, Corporate Parent Anthony Langley for Piller Power Systems, Inc.. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#14

(#14) LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robert Ottinger dated February 12, 2021. Document filed by Justin Jurek..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#13

(#13) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Robert Ottinger re: that this action be filed as related to 3:21-cv-150. Document filed by Justin Jurek..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. . Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#9

(#10) DECLARATION of Frank P. Izzo in Support re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 23, 2020 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - October 29, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - November 2, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - California Lawsuit, #5 Exhibit E - Docket Report for California Lawsuit).(Izzo, Frank) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth A. Novikoff on behalf of Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Novikoff, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Mule on behalf of Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dusenbery, Finn) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF000616-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23734749).Document filed by Justin Jurek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Stay. Application granted. This case shall be stayed pending resolution of Piller's motion to dismiss the related action before the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Within one week of the resolution of that motion, the parties shall submit a joint status letter providing the Court with a copy of the decision and proposing next steps in the instant action. The initial pre-trial conference, currently scheduled for February 26, 2021, is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/18/2021) (rj) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER MOTION to Stay regarding Defendant's letter motion for a stay in this action addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Michael Mule dated February 18, 2021. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/19/2021 (rj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER with respect to #14 Letter Motion to Stay. Should Plaintiff oppose the motion to stay proceedings, it shall file a letter no later than February 19, 2021, articulating why the stay should not be granted. Absent a response from Plaintiff by that date, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/16/2021) (rj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Piller Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent Langley Holdings plc, Corporate Parent Anthony Langley for Piller Power Systems, Inc.. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robert Ottinger dated February 12, 2021. Document filed by Justin Jurek..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Robert Ottinger re: that this action be filed as related to 3:21-cv-150. Document filed by Justin Jurek..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. . Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Reginald Charles Richards in Support re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Trade Secret Agreement).(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Frank P. Izzo in Support re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Piller Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 23, 2020 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - October 29, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - November 2, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - California Lawsuit, #5 Exhibit E - Docket Report for California Lawsuit).(Izzo, Frank) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth A. Novikoff on behalf of Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Novikoff, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Mule on behalf of Piller Power Systems, Inc...(Mule, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dusenbery, Finn) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ottinger, Robert) Modified on 1/29/2021 (dnh). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF000616-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23734749).Document filed by Justin Jurek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PILLER USA INC; DBA : PILLER POWER SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth A. Novikoff