This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2019 at 07:32:32 (UTC).

Pilipenko v. Carter et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Pilipenko filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Carter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24054

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inna Pilipenko

Defendants

Lawrence Carter

Global Healthcare Advisors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Lewis Elkins

Joshua Michael Entin

Defendant Attorney

Bretton I. Pollack

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Lawrence Carter response due 12/6/2019; Global Healthcare Advisors, LLC response due 12/6/2019 PER ORDER DE#21 . (drz) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order to Vacate re #19 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default, #20 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default, Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) VACTED PER ORDER DE#21 -Clerks Entry of Default as to Lawrence Carter, Global Healthcare Advisors, LLC per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #19 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/25/2019. (drz) Modified on 11/26/2019 (drz). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) VACATED PER ORDER DE#21 -Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default(s) as to Lawrence Carter, Global Healthcare Advisors, LLC. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 11/26/2019 (drz). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Inna Pilipenko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elkins, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Statement of: Statement of Claim by Inna Pilipenko re #10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Elkins, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT Per DE 10 against All Defendants, filed by Inna Pilipenko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Elkins, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Inna Pilipenko re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (Elkins, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER setting settlement conference (Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mkr) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Compliance by Inna Pilipenko re #9 Scheduling Order,, (Elkins, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER AND REFERRAL IN A CTIONS BROUGHT UNDER TH E FAIR LABORSTANDARDS ACT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/22/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Lawrence Carter, Global Healthcare Advisors, LLC. (mc) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Lawrence Carter by Inna Pilipenko (Entin, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Global Healthcare Advisors LLC by Inna Pilipenko (Entin, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the The Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12027831, filed by Inna PILIPENKO.(Elkins, Michael) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/1/2019) (drz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (drz). (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less