This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 07:55:21 (UTC).

PIERVIL v. GRAVES et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 PIERVIL filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against GRAVES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENEL JASON PIERVIL

Gainesville, FL 32641

Defendants

ASHLEY MOODY

ROBERT GIBSON

LIFESTREAMS BEHAVIORAL CENTER

BRAD KING

MICHAEL GRAVES

CAPTAIN CYNTHIA BROOKS

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/24/2020. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form for non-prisoner litigants for actions arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Plaintiff shall fill out the complaint form in full and file it with the Clerk on or before October 26, 2020. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) (Amended) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (kdm) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (kdm) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: VENEL JASON PIERVIL, NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION AND TREATMENT CENTER, 1200 NE 55 BLVD, GAINESVILLE, FL 32641. (kdm) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CYNTHIA BROOKS, ROBERT GIBSON, MICHAEL GRAVES, BRAD KING, LIFESTREAMS BEHAVIORAL CENTER, ASHLEY MOODY, filed by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadline per #5 Order --- First Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/24/2020. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form for non-prisoner litigants for actions arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Plaintiff shall fill out the complaint form in full and file it with the Clerk on or before October 26, 2020. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #4 (Amended) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (Amended) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (kdm) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (kdm) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: VENEL JASON PIERVIL, NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION AND TREATMENT CENTER, 1200 NE 55 BLVD, GAINESVILLE, FL 32641. (kdm) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CYNTHIA BROOKS, ROBERT GIBSON, MICHAEL GRAVES, BRAD KING, LIFESTREAMS BEHAVIORAL CENTER, ASHLEY MOODY, filed by VENEL JASON PIERVIL. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant