This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:17:37 (UTC).

Pierson v. Reverse Mortage Solutions Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Pierson filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Reverse Mortage Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Gren Scholer and David L. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03146

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

Referral Judge

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Concepcion Pierson

Defendants

Reverse Mortage Solutions Inc

Seattle Bank

Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard J Deaguero

Attorney at Law Office of Richard J Deaguero

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 304

Dallas, TX 75234

Defendant Attorney

Mark D Cronenwett

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann PC

14160 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Seattle Bank re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Seattle Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court GRANTS Defendant Seattle Bank's #7 motion for reconsideration and WITHDRAWS February 4, 2022, #6 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation. The Court concludes that Defendants Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. were improperly joined and should be dismissed without prejudice, and that, with the dismissal of Defendants Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., complete diversity of citizenship exists, and the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action under 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/8/2022) (svc) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Findings and Recommendations on Case filed by Seattle Bank. filed by Seattle Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) ***WITHDRAWN per document #8 ****FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES AGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned concludes that Defendant Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. was not improperly joined and that the Court should remand this action to the 116th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, from which it was removed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/4/2022) (mcrd) Modified on 2/8/2022 (svc). (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Seattle Bank. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff Concepcion Pierson is ORDERED to file a brief by 1/18/2022 explaining whether, as Defendant Seattle Bank argues in its Notice of Removal, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. weew improperly joined and, if so, should be dismissed without prejudice from this lawsuit and whether subject matter jurisdiction therefore exists based on the complete diversity between any remaining, properly joined parties. Defendant Seattle Bank is invited to file a response brief of no more than 10 pages by 2/1/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/17/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seattle Bank. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Seattle Bank. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12463389) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Seattle Bank re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Seattle Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court GRANTS Defendant Seattle Bank's #7 motion for reconsideration and WITHDRAWS February 4, 2022, #6 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation. The Court concludes that Defendants Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. were improperly joined and should be dismissed without prejudice, and that, with the dismissal of Defendants Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., complete diversity of citizenship exists, and the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action under 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/8/2022) (svc) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Findings and Recommendations on Case filed by Seattle Bank. filed by Seattle Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***WITHDRAWN per document #8 ****FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES AGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned concludes that Defendant Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. was not improperly joined and that the Court should remand this action to the 116th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, from which it was removed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/4/2022) (mcrd) Modified on 2/8/2022 (svc). (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Seattle Bank. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff Concepcion Pierson is ORDERED to file a brief by 1/18/2022 explaining whether, as Defendant Seattle Bank argues in its Notice of Removal, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. weew improperly joined and, if so, should be dismissed without prejudice from this lawsuit and whether subject matter jurisdiction therefore exists based on the complete diversity between any remaining, properly joined parties. Defendant Seattle Bank is invited to file a response brief of no more than 10 pages by 2/1/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/17/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seattle Bank. (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Seattle Bank. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12463389) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seattle Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Mackie Wolfe Zientz & Mann, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Douglas Cronenwett