This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 10:05:01 (UTC).

Pierson, Jr. v. National Healthcare Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Pierson, Jr filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against National Healthcare Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00485

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Dale Pierson, Jr.

Defendant

National Healthcare Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Turner, IV

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

J. Russ Bryant

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A- Robert Pierson Consent to Join

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to National Healthcare Corporation. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail) (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/9/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 3:00 p.m., Thursday, September 22, 2022, by telephone conference, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753 access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/22/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Robert Dale Pierson, Jr.. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion to Continue as moot, see DE #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/8/2022. (jm) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion to Continue as moot, see DE #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/8/2022. (jm) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Robert Dale Pierson, Jr.. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 3:00 p.m., Thursday, September 22, 2022, by telephone conference, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753 access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/22/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, and Robert E. Morelli, III admitted to this court. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/9/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to National Healthcare Corporation. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail) (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National Healthcare Corporation (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3619073), filed by Robert Dale Pierson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Robert Pierson Consent to Join)(bs) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Healthcare, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant