This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:10:34 (UTC).

PIERRE v. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 PIERRE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JERRY PIERRE

Raiford, FL 32083

Respondents

STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - It is recommended that this case be DISMISSED for failure to comply with an order of the court and failure to prosecute. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/14/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/11/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing the Clerk to Correct the docket; Respondent Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections and for the Clerk to send Petitioner a blank 28 USC 2254 form and blank motion to proceed informa pauper form Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/10/19.( Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2020, Motion/Fee due by 1/9/2020.) (bkp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: JERRY PIERRE, M48726, FLORIDA STATE PRISON, PO BOX 800, RAIFORD, FL 32083. (kdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JERRY PIERRE. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - It is recommended that this case be DISMISSED for failure to comply with an order of the court and failure to prosecute. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/14/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/11/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order -- Amended Pleadings and Motion/Fee due by 1/9/2020. (*** None filed to date. ***) (kdm) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing the Clerk to Correct the docket; Respondent Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections and for the Clerk to send Petitioner a blank 28 USC 2254 form and blank motion to proceed informa pauper form Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/10/19.( Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2020, Motion/Fee due by 1/9/2020.) (bkp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: JERRY PIERRE, M48726, FLORIDA STATE PRISON, PO BOX 800, RAIFORD, FL 32083. (kdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JERRY PIERRE. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less