This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:12:45 (UTC).

Pierre Louis v. Connelly et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Pierre Louis against Connelly in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12082

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Pierre Louis

Concord, MA 01742

Defendants

James Connelly

James Perkins

Robert Suza

Stoughton District Court

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: service of summons and complaint by the U.S, Marshal. Copy of Local Rule 4.1. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Concord (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#10

(#10) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $17.55. The remainder of the fee, $332.45, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the complaint on James Connelly, James Perkins and Robert Suza. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service.. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of issuance of summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcus Pierre Louis.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: service of summons and complaint by the U.S, Marshal. Copy of Local Rule 4.1. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at MCI Concord (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $17.55. The remainder of the fee, $332.45, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2).The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the complaint on James Connelly, James Perkins and Robert Suza. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service.. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of issuance of summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filling fee. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcus Pierre Louis.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Pierre Louis.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marcus Pierre Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.