This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 06:05:16 (UTC).

Pierce v. Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Pierce filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00993

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Pierce

Defendant

Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip M. Murphy, II

Attorney at Law Office of Phillip M. Murphy II

4717 Grand Avenue, Suite 250

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Claudia My Tran

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-KCMO

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Daniel Patrick Johnson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-KCMO

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2020. Teleconference set for 1/29/2021 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021, 1:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021, 8:30 PM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 2/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#11

(#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. (D's 1st ROGs & RFPDs to P) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Pierce of Interrogatories, RFAs, and RFPs filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/4/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/21/2020. Signed on 12/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

MAP General Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal with State Court by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Yang Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit A - Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1916-CV27136, filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6624137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Yang Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2020. Teleconference set for 1/29/2021 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021, 1:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021, 8:30 PM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 2/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. (D's 1st ROGs & RFPDs to P) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Pierce of Interrogatories, RFAs, and RFPs filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/4/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/21/2020. Signed on 12/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal with State Court by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1916-CV27136, filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6624137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Yang Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.