This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:24:44 (UTC).

Pierce v. Collier et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Pierce against Collier in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03194

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Boyd Pierce

Defendants

Tony O'Hare

Medical Department

Tracy Hutto

Bryan Collier

David Dickerson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by William Boyd Pierce.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#8

RESTRICTED

9 #1

Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Form

#5

(#5) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to William Boyd Pierce. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 9/27/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

5 #1

Appendix

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Boyd Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

3 #2

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Boyd Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (rcastro, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by William Boyd Pierce, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Form) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#11

(#11) MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by William Boyd Pierce, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Jurisdiction and Venue by William Boyd Pierce, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to William Boyd Pierce. More Definite Statement due by 10/23/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by William Boyd Pierce, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to William Boyd Pierce. More Definite Statement due by 10/23/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Form) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Boyd Pierce, filed. (rcastro, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Boyd Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (rcastro, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by William Boyd Pierce, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to William Boyd Pierce. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 9/27/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Jurisdiction and Venue by William Boyd Pierce, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Boyd Pierce, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by William Boyd Pierce.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.