This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 10:58:29 (UTC).

PIERAS v. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 PIERAS filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-18543

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCOS PIERAS

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA d/b/a AUDI OF AMERICA, INC.

AUDI AG

VOLKSWAGEN AG

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. a New Jersey Corporation doing business as AUDI OF AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSELL D. PAUL

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

1818 Market St., Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Amey J. Park

Attorney at Berger Montague

1818 Market Street Ste 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN

Attorney at CAPSTONE LAW APC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

ABIGAIL GERTNER

Attorney at BERGER MONTAGUE PC

Defendant Attorney

HOMER B. RAMSEY

Attorney at HERZFELD & RUBIN, LLC

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12044681.) (Park, Amey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#14

(#14) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cody R. Padgett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number BNJDC-12044590.) (Park, Amey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #10 , #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tarek H. Zohdy, Esq. and Cody R. Padgett, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/27/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER that the Clerkis hereby directed to consolidate this matter with Pieras v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., 2:20-cv-18543-MCA-MAH; that all current deadlines to respond to the First Amended Complaint in May v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., and to the Complaint in Pieras v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., are hereby vacated; that Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint byJanuary 15, 2021, and VWGoA shall respond in accordance with the following briefing schedule; that the Scheduling Conference currently set in the May action on February 24, 2021 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer and the deadline of February 22, 2021 for the Parties to file a joint discovery plan are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/13/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cody R Padgett by MARCOS PIERAS. (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy by MARCOS PIERAS. (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#7

CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Stipulation filed by Homer Ramsey on 12/15/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event Stipulation found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WEINMANN, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL GERTNER on behalf of MARCOS PIERAS (GERTNER, ABIGAIL) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of MARCOS PIERAS (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11784796) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARCOS PIERAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(PAUL, RUSSELL) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, CODY R. PADGETT and TAREK H. ZOHDY, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12044681.) (Park, Amey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cody R. Padgett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number BNJDC-12044590.) (Park, Amey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 , #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tarek H. Zohdy, Esq. and Cody R. Padgett, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/27/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER that the Clerkis hereby directed to consolidate this matter with Pieras v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., 2:20-cv-18543-MCA-MAH; that all current deadlines to respond to the First Amended Complaint in May v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., and to the Complaint in Pieras v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., are hereby vacated; that Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint byJanuary 15, 2021, and VWGoA shall respond in accordance with the following briefing schedule; that the Scheduling Conference currently set in the May action on February 24, 2021 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer and the deadline of February 22, 2021 for the Parties to file a joint discovery plan are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/13/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 2:20-cv-09708-MCA-MAH. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cody R Padgett, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy. Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cody R Padgett by MARCOS PIERAS. (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tarek H. Zohdy by MARCOS PIERAS. (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., d/b/a Audi of America on 12/14/2020, filed by MARCOS PIERAS. (PAUL, RUSSELL) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Stipulation filed by Homer Ramsey on 12/15/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event Stipulation found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: By stipulation of the parties, Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint is extended through and including February 18, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/16/2020. (TAD) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN RICHARD WEINMANN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WEINMANN, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL GERTNER on behalf of MARCOS PIERAS (GERTNER, ABIGAIL) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of MARCOS PIERAS (Park, Amey) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AUDI AG, VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11784796) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARCOS PIERAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(PAUL, RUSSELL) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Audi AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen AG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOMER B. RAMSEY