This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 17:31:02 (UTC).

Pieper et al v. 640 Octavia, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Pieper filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 640 Octavia, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01038

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSE MONTOYA

Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper

Defendants

Edward Kountze

640 Octavia, LLC

Justin Hutto

Neil Martinson

Odlaw, Inc.

Jean Bolden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Garibaldi

Attorney at Peretz and Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 202

San Francisco, CA 94111

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 202

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Scott Walston

Attorney at The Walston Law Group APC

Four Charlton Court

San Francisco, CA 94123

Robin Amelia Sheenan

Attorney at The Walston Law Group APC

Four Charlton Court

San Francisco, CA 94123

Michael Edward Myers

Attorney at Donahue Davies LLP

P.O. Box 277010

Sacramento, CA 95827-7010

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Declaration (Supplemental) of Yosef Peretz

#15

#14

#13

#12

10 #5

Objection to Declarations of Neil Martinson and Justin Hutto

10 #4

Notice of Motion

10 #3

Declaration of Jose Montoya

10 #2

Declaration of Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper

10 #1

Declaration of Yosef Peretz

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Receipt from Superior Court of California County of San Francisco. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Remark: Case remanded to Superior Court of California County of San Francisco (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION TO REMAND AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJose Montoya, Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Yosef Peretz)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet; Complaint; First Amended Complaint; ADR Package; Notice of Removal served on Odlaw, Inc. on April 1, 2019, filed by Jose Montoya, Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/16/2019) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) filed by 640 Octavia, LLC. (Myers, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Montoya, Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper on Defendant Neil Martinson (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing re #10 MOTION to Remand previously set for 4/25/2019 8:00 AM is rescheduled to 5/2/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. The previously set briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand filed by Jose Montoya, Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/11/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yosef Peretz, #2 Declaration of Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper, #3 Declaration of Jose Montoya, #4 Notice of Motion, #5 Objection to Declarations of Neil Martinson and Justin Hutto)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Montoya, Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper on Defendant Justin Hutto (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/4/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUA SPONTE REFERRAL Regarding Relatedness by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 6/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is now due by 6/11/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/26/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 640 Octavia, LLC, Jean Bolden, Edward Kountze E-filer is Informed not to Enter Parties in all Capitalized Letters. E-filer did not Enter all Defendant Parties . E-filer Entered Plaintiff & Defendant Party Incorrectly. E-filer did not Enter the Other Court's Information. Corrected Case Title from all Capitalized Letters. E-filer Selected Origin 1 (Original Proceeding) which is Incorrect. Should be 2 Removal from State Court. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (NO PROCESS); from superior court of the state of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-18-571890. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13120965). Filed by 640 Octavia, LLC, Jean Bolden, Edward Kountze. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service proof of service)(Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yosef Peretz