This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2022 at 09:06:11 (UTC).

Piech v. TeeTime Delivery, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Piech filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against TeeTime Delivery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02859

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Piech

Defendants

TeeTime Delivery, Inc.

Jason Tinman, individually

Jason Tinman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 1137

Chicago, IL 60604

Samuel David Engelson

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Alison Blair Crane

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Audrey Olson Gardner

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

150 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffrey L Rudd

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Consent To Sue - Walter Piech

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Walter Piech by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Walter Piech by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 8/16/2022 at 11:00 a.m. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Defendant TeeTime Delivery Inc., Executed Waiver Of Service

6 #2

Defendant Jason Tinman, individually Executed Waiver Of Service

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Alison Blair Crane (Crane, Alison) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Jeffrey L Rudd (Rudd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Audrey Olson Gardner (Gardner, Audrey) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Crane, Alison) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Crane, Alison) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Audrey Olson Gardner (Gardner, Audrey) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Jeffrey L Rudd (Rudd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TeeTime Delivery, Inc., Jason Tinman by Alison Blair Crane (Crane, Alison) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Walter Piech. TeeTime Delivery, Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Jason Tinman waiver sent on 6/1/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Defendant TeeTime Delivery Inc., Executed Waiver Of Service, #2 Defendant Jason Tinman, individually Executed Waiver Of Service)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 8/16/2022 at 11:00 a.m. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(CORRECTED) CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Walter Piech by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Walter Piech by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WALTER PIECH, on behalf of himself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. TEETIME DELIVERY, INC. and JASON TINMAN, individually filed by Walter Piech; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19517564. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue - Walter Piech)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less