This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2020 at 10:07:02 (UTC).

Picozzi v. State of Nevada et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Picozzi filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Defendants

NNCC Prison

Mr. Hannah

Barth

George

nurse Blanco

Mark

Dr Martin

Lisa Johnson

William Kuloloia

c/o Beck

Marie Cervanes

Yeates

Deborah Strickland

c/o Perrone

Binder

Treadwell

c/o Shannon Dematos

Br Silber

High Desert State Prison

c/o Berumen

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HDSP Law Library

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Motion for Appointment of Counsel

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Letter

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Relief, filed by Plaintiff Mark Picozzi. (ADR) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Interested Party Hernan Munoz. (ADR) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to be Added to Complaint, filed by Interested Party Hernan Munoz. (ADR) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE re Motion for Clarification filed in Case No. 2:20-cv-00593-GMN-NJK, filed by Mark Picozzi. (ADR) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Minute Order, addressed to Hernan Munoz. Clerk re-mailed with updated prisoner ID: 1140728. (ADR) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADDENDUM to #1 -1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Mark Picozzi. (ADR) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/30/2020. MOTIONS: A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE re Criminal Complaint, filed by Mark Picozzi. (ADR) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Mark Picozzi. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (ADR) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TREADWELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Barth is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGH DESERT STATE PRISON is a litigant

Latest cases where The Law Offices of George A Gallegos is a litigant