This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2019 at 07:39:28 (UTC).

Pickerel v. JPL Recovery, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Pickerel against JPL Recovery, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00535

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Louis Guirola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandy Pickerel

Defendant

JPL Recovery, LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JPL Recovery, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4067129), filed by Brandy Pickerel (Attachments: #1 A - Emails, #2 B - Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

B - Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Settlement by Brandy Pickerel (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JPL Recovery, LLC. (RLW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

1 #1

A - Emails

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brandy Pickerel (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Style of case is incorrect as to the division. Attorney is advised that the correct division is Southern. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings. (RLW) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brandy Pickerel (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/5/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Settlement by Brandy Pickerel (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Remark: Original summons for service mailed to attorney to address on summons via regular us mail. (RLW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to JPL Recovery, LLC. (RLW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JPL Recovery, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4067129), filed by Brandy Pickerel (Attachments: #1 A - Emails, #2 B - Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.