This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2020 at 07:07:19 (UTC).

Picetti v. Stryker Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Picetti filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Stryker Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Picetti

Defendants

Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Stryker Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Areen Babajanian

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Douglas Han

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant Attorneys

Michele Jane Beilke

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brian Gabriel Mendoza Huey

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope St., Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia Yenha Trankiem

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Andy Quesnelle ISO Notice of Removal

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byRobert Picetti. (Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byHowmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation. (Huey, Brian Gabriel) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion haring previously set for 2/26/20 is continued. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike Allegations. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (Related documents(s) #7 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Picetti (Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert Picetti. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/18/2020. Replies due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447)(Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike Allegations ) filed byHowmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation. (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike Allegations ) filed byRobert Picetti. (Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike Allegations filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/23/2020. Replies due by 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review G eneral Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Superior Court of California - Alameda County. Their case number is RG19044860. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14032878). Filed by Stryker Corporation, Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Andy Quesnelle ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 1/2/2020) Modified on 1/3/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Areen Babajanian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Han