This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2020 at 08:00:04 (UTC).

Picetti v. STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Picetti filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-07454

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Picetti

Defendants

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation

Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Areen Babajanian

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Douglas Han

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Avenue, Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Gabriel Mendoza Huey

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope St., Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michele Jane Beilke

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia Yenha Trankiem

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#17

#15

#14

13 #4

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Robert Picetti's Motion to Remand

13 #3

Supplement Document for Evidentiary Objections

13 #2

Supplement Document for Request for Judicial Notice

13 #1

Declaration of Areen Babajanian

#13

12 #4

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Robert Picetti's Motion to Remand

12 #3

Supplement Document for Evidentiary Objections

12 #2

Supplement Document for Request Judicial Notice

12 #1

Declaration of Areen Babajanian

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

#7

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byRobert Picetti. (Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE - JANUARY 22, 2021 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byHowmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation. (Trankiem, Julia) (Filed on 12/8/2020) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Picetti. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Areen Babajanian, #2 Supplement Document for Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Supplement Document for Evidentiary Objections, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Robert Picetti's Motion to Remand)(Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached- Document cannot be opened. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Picetti (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***Cannot Open- Please See #13 for corrected document*** MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Picetti. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Areen Babajanian, #2 Supplement Document for Request Judicial Notice, #3 Supplement Document for Evidentiary Objections, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Robert Picetti's Motion to Remand)(Babajanian, Areen) (Filed on 11/23/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/6/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/4/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation.. (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation Re: #1 . #17 Notice of Removal by STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) and fi le as a separate docket entry Re: #1 . #17 Notice of Removal by STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation (Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California - Alameda County. Their case number is RG19044860. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15104967). Filed byHowmedica Osteonics Corp., STRYKER CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit I to Notice of Removal, #10 Declaration of Andrew Quesnelle ISO Notice of Removal, #11 Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #13 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Gabriel M. Huey ISO Notice of Removal, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Beilke, Michele) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Areen Babajanian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Han