This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 09:34:29 (UTC).

Piccirilli v. Spartanburg County et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Piccirilli filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Spartanburg County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacquelyn D Austin and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-03259

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli

Mauldin, SC 29607

Defendants

Hon. Philip Sinclair

Chadwick Pye

Rick Vieth

Ofc. John Doe

Travis Moore

Amy Cox

SCSO Sgt. Tracy Moss

Jacqueline Piccirilli

Unknown Sheriff Investigator

Spartanburg County

Sheriff Chuck Wright

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/21/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/21/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli. (rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli. Service due by 12/10/2020(rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order, 11 Transfer of Case Management, #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli 927 Goldendale Court Mauldin, SC 29607 (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 East Washington Street, Greenville SC 29609. (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/21/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/21/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/21/2020.(gpre, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli. (rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Nicholas Piccirilli. Service due by 12/10/2020(rweb, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPARTANBURG COUNTY is a litigant