This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:21:53 (UTC).

Phox v. 21c Management LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Phox filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against 21c Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00846

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaRonda Phox

Kansas City, MO 64130

Defendant

21c Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Elizabeth Welch

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Erin M Naeger

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 12/17/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Modified on 12/17/2020 a copy has been mailed to plaintiff with Order #17 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 12/17/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Modified on 12/17/2020 to reflect a copy has been mailed to LaRonda Phox 3921 Norton Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LaRonda Phox on behalf of Plaintiff LaRonda Phox.(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#14

(#14) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION for order disqualify opposing counsel filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant 21c Management LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#13

(#13) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order) by 21c Management LLC. (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#12

(#12) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ann Molloy(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION to disqualify opposing counsel filed by LaRonda Phox. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant 21c Management LLC.(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #7 motion to appoint counsel. Signed on 11/3/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) (Clerk's Note: Order mailed 1st class to: LaRonda Phox, 3921 Norton Avenue, Kansas City, MO 64130) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to appoint counsel filed by LaRonda Phox. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of 21c Management LLC.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/21/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Modified on 10/21/2020 to reflect a copy has been mailed to LaRonda Phox 3921 Norton Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.MAP Notice and General Order mailed via USPS to Pro Se Plaintiff at 3921 Norton Ave, Kansas City, MO 64130.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of appearance by Erin M Naeger on behalf of 21c Management LLC (Attorney Erin M Naeger added to party 21c Management LLC(pty:dft))(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Removal

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV15919, filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of 21c Management LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7103876. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 12/17/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Modified on 12/17/2020 a copy has been mailed to plaintiff with Order #17 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 12/17/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Modified on 12/17/2020 to reflect a copy has been mailed to LaRonda Phox 3921 Norton Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/17/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Pro Se Plaintiff appears not. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Erin Naeger and Sara Welch. Time in court: 10:30 a.m. to 10:45 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LaRonda Phox on behalf of Plaintiff LaRonda Phox.(Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION for order disqualify opposing counsel filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant 21c Management LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order) by 21c Management LLC. (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) Modified on 12/2/2020 to reflect a copy of this notice mailed on today's date to LaRonda Phox 3921 Norton Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130. (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ann Molloy(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to disqualify opposing counsel filed by LaRonda Phox. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Amended as to location only. In accordance with the General Order issued on November 13, 2020, suspending all non-emergent in-person proceedings through January 4, 2021. This hearing is rescheduled from an in-person proceeding to a telephonic proceeding. (Clerk's Note: This ECF notification and the conference call-in numbers have been mailed 1st class to: LaRonda Phox, 3921 Norton Avenue, Kansas City, MO 64130)(Richard, Tracey) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Erin M Naeger on behalf of Defendant 21c Management LLC.(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #7 motion to appoint counsel. Signed on 11/3/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) (Clerk's Note: Order mailed 1st class to: LaRonda Phox, 3921 Norton Avenue, Kansas City, MO 64130) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to appoint counsel filed by LaRonda Phox. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of 21c Management LLC.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/21/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Modified on 10/21/2020 to reflect a copy has been mailed to LaRonda Phox 3921 Norton Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130 (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.MAP Notice and General Order mailed via USPS to Pro Se Plaintiff at 3921 Norton Ave, Kansas City, MO 64130.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of appearance by Erin M Naeger on behalf of 21c Management LLC (Attorney Erin M Naeger added to party 21c Management LLC(pty:dft))(Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by 21c Management LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV15919, filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of 21c Management LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7103876. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin M Naeger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Elizabeth Welch