This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2021 at 09:26:24 (UTC).

Phoenix West Owners Association, Inc. v. Engineered Cooling Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Phoenix West Owners Association, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Callie V. S. Granade and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00331

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phoenix West Owners Association, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Engineered Cooling Services, LLC

International Fidelity Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendants and Cross Claimants

Hill Company Gulf States, LLC

MGM Products, Inc.

Specialty Products, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendants and Cross Defendants

MGM Products, Inc.

Specialty Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica M. McDill

Attorney at Chason & Chason, P.C.

P.O. Box 100

Bay Minette, AL 36507

Joseph D. Thetford, Jr.

P.O. Box 100

Bay Minette, AL 36507

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Elliott Britton Monroe

Attorney at Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Patrick Patronas

Attorney at Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.

880 Montclair Rd, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Harold Wesley Reeder

Attorney at Emmanuel, Sheppard & Condon

P.O. Box 1271

Pensacola, FL 32591

John Gordon Terhaar, I

Attorney at Emmanuel Sheppard And Condon

30 South Spring Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Nathan Lewis Burrow

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smit

63 S. Royal Street, Suite 302

Mobile, AL 36602

A. Joe Peddy

Attorney at Smith, Spires & Peddy

2015 Second Ave., Ste. 200

Birmingham, AL 35203

Clarence Rivers, IV

Attorney at Smith Spires & Peddy, P.C.

2015 2Nd Avenue North, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35203

Larry S. Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Jonathan Griffith

Attorney at Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

800 Shades Creek Parkway, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35209

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

A. Joe Peddy

Attorney at Smith, Spires & Peddy

2015 Second Ave., Ste. 200

Birmingham, AL 35203

Clarence Rivers, IV

Attorney at Smith Spires & Peddy, P.C.

2015 2Nd Avenue North, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35203

Larry S. Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Jonathan Griffith

Attorney at Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

800 Shades Creek Parkway, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

45 #1

Cross-Claim

45 #45

Main Document

#39

#37

24 #4

Exhibit Ex. D to ECS' 3rd Party Complaint

24 #3

Exhibit Ex. C to ECS' 3rd Party Complaint

24 #2

Exhibit Ex. B to ECS' 3rd Party Complaint

24 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to ECS' 3rd Party Complaint

24 #24

Main Document

4 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1 to ECS's Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswers to #45 Crossclaim due from MGM Products, Inc. and Specialty Products, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 12(a)(1)(B). (mab) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ANSWER to #24 Third Party Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against MGM Products, Inc., Specialty Products, Inc. by Hill Company Gulf States, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim) (Burrow, Nathan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#44) Order, ( Status Conference, by telephone, to discuss the question of whether to stay the entire case, set for 9/22/2021 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/15/2021. (eec) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #37 filed by Specialty Products, Inc., Disclosure Statement Mailed #39 filed by Specialty Products, Inc. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#42) Order. The Preliminary Scheduling Order (Doc. 40) is WITHDRAWN. The Order was inadvertently entered in an action partially stayed. (See Doc. 31). In all likelihood, the entire action will be stayed pending arbitration and mediation once all third party defendants have appeared and the court has conducted a second conference with counsel. Counsel for Third Party Plaintiff shall immediately notify the Court once all Third Party Defendants have been served. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/15/21. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence Rivers, IV on behalf of MGM Products, Inc. (Rivers, Clarence) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) (WITHDRAWN per Order Doc. 42)PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/14/2021. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab) Modified on 9/15/2021 (mab). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to ThirdParty Defendant Specialty Products, Inc. ; Disclosure Statement Due 8/17/2021 pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1(a). (mab) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to #24 Third Party Complaint, by MGM Products, Inc.. (Peddy, A.) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ThirdParty Defendant Specialty Products, Inc.. (Logsdon, Larry) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION and APPLICATION for John G. Terhaar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2849504, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by International Fidelity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Terhaar, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response not later than August 16, 2021. Should a reply to the response be deemed necessary, it shall be filed no later than August 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/2/21. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC (twg) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC (Cassady, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. (Monroe, Elliott) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ECS's Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to ECS's Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Monroe, Elliott) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECS' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. (Monroe, Elliott) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent to Notice of Removal by Defendant International Fidelity Insurance Company, filed by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. (Patronas, Patrick) Modified on 8/10/2021 (mab). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2843897, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Engineered Cooling Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal) (Patronas, Patrick) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry S Logsdon(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L. Griffith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albry Joe Peddy