This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2022 at 01:12:32 (UTC).

Philpott v. Panera, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Philpott filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Panera, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00928

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debora Philpott

Defendant

Panera, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Harmik Yeremian

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Im

Daniel C. Whang

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/8/19 ORDERING that #11 Order is SET ASIDE and this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) (SET ASIDE, REFER to #13 Order) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/25/19 ORDERING this action DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/9/2019 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

7 #1

Proof of Service

#7

6 #2

VDRP

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

#5

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/8/19 ORDERING that #11 Order is SET ASIDE and this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amended Dismissal of Class Action Without Prejudice re #10 Stipulation of Dismissal - ATY by Debora Philpott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeremian, David) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (SET ASIDE, REFER to #13 Order) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/25/19 ORDERING this action DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/9/2019 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION of DISMISSAL without prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Debora Philpott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeremian, David) Modified on 9/27/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/2/19 EXTENDING defendant's time to response to plaintiff's complaint until 7/26/2019. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading by Panera, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Im, Christopher) Modified on 6/25/2019 (Reader, L). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Panera, LLC. Attorney Whang, Daniel C added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Whang, Daniel) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Panera, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Im, Christopher) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Panera, LLC. (Im, Christopher) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Courtney Higgins re #1 Notice of Removal. (Im, Christopher) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Christopher Im re #1 Notice of Removal. (Im, Christopher) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00254303 by Panera, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8277331) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Im, Christopher) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less