This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 08:23:55 (UTC).

PHILPOT v. BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 PHILPOT filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03089

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARRY G PHILPOT

LARRY G. PHILPOT

Defendants

BROWN NAFF PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. DBA DCAGENDA

BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. a District of Columbia company doing business as DCAGENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristine M. Maher

Attorney at GRAYDON, HEAD & RITCHEY, LLP

312 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 4502

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Notice and Consent

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/02/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

(#4) ERRATA AND NOTICE OF CORRECTION by LARRY G. PHILPOT #1 Complaint, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA AND NOTICE OF CORRECTION by LARRY G. PHILPOT #1 Complaint, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Maher, Kristine) Modified on 10/29/2020 (zsb). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine M. Maher on behalf of LARRY G PHILPOT (Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Image

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Certificate

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Subject Photo

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BROWN NAFF PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. DBA DCAGENDA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7762936) filed by LARRY G PHILPOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subject Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Image, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/02/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BROWN, NAFF, PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #3 Errata was entered in error. Counsel refiled as docket entry #4 . (zsb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA AND NOTICE OF CORRECTION by LARRY G. PHILPOT #1 Complaint, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA AND NOTICE OF CORRECTION by LARRY G. PHILPOT #1 Complaint, filed by LARRY G. PHILPOT. (Maher, Kristine) Modified on 10/29/2020 (zsb). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine M. Maher on behalf of LARRY G PHILPOT (Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BROWN NAFF PITTS OMNIMEDIA, INC. DBA DCAGENDA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7762936) filed by LARRY G PHILPOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subject Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Copyright Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Infringing Image, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Maher, Kristine) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less