This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 11:08:00 (UTC).

Philo et al v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Philo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott Philo

Massagechairsforless.com LLC

Massagechairsforless.com, LLC

Scott Philo doing business as Massagechairsforless.com, LLC

Defendants

Google LLC

Google LLC doing business as Google Adwords doing business as Google AdWords Express

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert M.A. Nadeau

Attorney at Nadeau Legal PLLC

311 Alfred St.

Biddeford, ME 04005

Defendant Attorneys

Bronwyn L. Roberts

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02116

Kyle Wong

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California St

San Francisco, CA 94111

William C. Saturley

Attorney at Preti Flaherty Beliveau Pachios LLP

57 N Main St, Po Box 1318

Concord, NH 03302-1318

Jeffrey M. Gutkin

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Addison Litton

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover St

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#28

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Notice to Superior Court of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit B to Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts

1 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts

1 #2

Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts ISO Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C. Saturley on behalf of Google LLC Attorney William C. Saturley added to party Google LLC(pty:dft).(Saturley, William) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Assented to Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 8/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr.(ko) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Assented to MOTION to Continue MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CONTINUANCE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING DATE Replaces document no. 33 filed by Google LLC. Follow up on Objection on 7/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #33 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Google LLC. Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile using the Motion to Continue event and enter in docket text: Replaces document no. 33. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 6/28/2019.(ko) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to #32 Order, filed by Google LLC. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr.(ko) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) PROCEDURAL ORDER: The clerk shall schedule an evidentiary hearing for purposes of resolving factual issues material to the forum selection clause as raised in document numbers 13, 16, 20, 23, 26, 27, 28, and 30. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo re: #30 Surreply to Reply to Objection to Motion to Transfer Venue (Nadeau, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SURREPLY to Reply to #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo. (Nadeau, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo re: #28 Surreply to Reply to Objection to Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Nadeau, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 3, 2019 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo, #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement by Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nadeau, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M.A. Nadeau on behalf of Massagechairsforless.com, LLC, Scott Philo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nadeau, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of Google LLC(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Google LLC. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Massagechairsforless.com, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by May 7, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-393-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement by Google LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Southern District, case number 226-2019-cv-00125 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1800521) filed by Google LLC. Answer Follow Up on 5/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Bronwyn Roberts, #5 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal, #6 Exhibit Notice to Superior Court of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William C. Saturley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bronwyn L. Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M. Gutkin