This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2020 at 09:30:15 (UTC).

Phillips v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Phillips filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F Heil, III, Frank H McCarthy and John E Dowdell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00394

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

Presiding Judges

John F Heil, III

John E Dowdell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tawny Annett Phillips

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Hunter Keith Bailey

Attorney at Smolen Law

611 S. Detroit Ave.

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John William Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman

1515 E 71St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Mark Thomas Steele

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman

1515 E 71St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John William Warren on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips [Note: Attorney John William Warren added to party Tawny Annett Phillips(pty:pla).] (Warren, John) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Tawny Annett Phillips(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#12

(#12) JURY DEMAND by Tawny Annett Phillips (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Return of Service

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Mayes County Docket

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number cj-2020-116 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2246084) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (With attachments) (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Bailey, Hunter) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John William Warren on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips [Note: Attorney John William Warren added to party Tawny Annett Phillips(pty:pla).] (Warren, John) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Tawny Annett Phillips(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Hamilton, Laura) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JURY DEMAND by Tawny Annett Phillips (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Tawny Annett Phillips (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Chief Judge John E Dowdell, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-394-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 20-CV-394-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number cj-2020-116 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2246084) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (With attachments) (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. by Tawny Annett Phillips (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura L Hamilton