This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:52:20 (UTC).

Phillips v. St. Louis Community Credit Union et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Phillips filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Louis Community Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew T. Schelp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01275

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew T. Schelp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clint Phillips, III

St. Louis, MO 63137

Defendants

St. Louis Community Credit Union

Derrick Greene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Bryan M. Kaemmerer

Attorney at MCCARTHY AND LEONARD LC

825 Maryville Centre Dr., Suite 300

Town And Country, MO 63017-5946

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM AND CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (TMT) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Strike #14 Supplemental Plaintiff's Brief Filed in Connection with his Amended Complaint by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#14

(#14) SUPPLEMENTAL re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (KCB) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#13

(#13) REPLY (to termed motion) re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#12

(#12) SUPPLEMENTAL re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (TMT) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

11 #1

Attachment Returned Documents

#11

(#11) RETURN LETTER from clerk to Clint Phillips, III re: Return of Documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Documents) (TMT) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs in Connection with his Amended Complaint by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Derrick Greene, St. Louis Community Credit Union Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III.(TMT) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

8 #1

Attachment Civil Complaint

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #3 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form complaint for a civil case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form in accordance with the instructions set out above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after receiving the amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on a Court-provided form within twenty-one (21) days in accordance with the instructions set forth herein, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/22/2020.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Complaint)(TMT) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#2

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Original Filing Form

#1

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Derrick Greene, St. Louis Community Credit Union Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III.(TMT) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM AND CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (TMT) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Strike #14 Supplemental Plaintiff's Brief Filed in Connection with his Amended Complaint by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUPPLEMENTAL re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (KCB) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY (to termed motion) re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUPPLEMENTAL re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (TMT) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN LETTER from clerk to Clint Phillips, III re: Return of Documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Documents) (TMT) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs in Connection with his Amended Complaint by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Derrick Greene, St. Louis Community Credit Union Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Clint Phillips, III.(TMT) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Thu Oct 1 15:12:09 CDT 2020 (Tillman, Tiffani) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #3 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form complaint for a civil case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form in accordance with the instructions set out above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after receiving the amended complaint, the Court will review it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on a Court-provided form within twenty-one (21) days in accordance with the instructions set forth herein, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/22/2020.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Complaint)(TMT) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant St. Louis Community Credit Union. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/28/2020.) (TMT) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Sep 17 12:01:10 CDT 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (MFG) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (MFG) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Clint Phillips, III. (MFG) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Clint Phillips, III. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less