This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 07:54:35 (UTC).

Phillips v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Phillips filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Smith's Food Drug Centers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00851

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Phillips

Defendant

Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce D. Tingey

Attorney at Tingey & Tingey

2001 W. Charleston Blvd.

Las Vegas, NV 89102

John T. Oblad

Attorney at Tingey Injury Law Firm

2001 W. Charleston Blvd.

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Jerry S. Busby

Attorney at Cooper Levenson, P.A.

3016 West Charleston Boulevard, Suite 195

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Gregory A Kraemer

Attorney at Cooper Levenson, P.A.

3016 West Charleston Boulevard, Suite 195

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 2/8/2021. Motions due by 3/10/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/12/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-812181-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6000169) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 2/8/2021. Motions due by 3/10/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #7 . Attorney Taylor Oblad, Bar #11430 is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/12/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/27/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-812181-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6000169) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce D. Tingey