This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2020 at 09:17:14 (UTC).

Phillips v. Alcon Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Phillips filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Alcon Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr, Alistair Newbern and Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judges

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kayla D. Phillips

Defendants

Alcon Vision, LLC

Alcon Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew R. Binkley

Attorney at Callahan & Binkley, PLC

321 E. Spring Street, Suite 304

Cookeville, TN 38501

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine H. Molloy

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (Tampa Office)

101 E Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

Gregory Ostfeld

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (Chicago Office)

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Taylor Arana

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (Chicago Office)

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Paul Savage Davidson

Attorney at Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, LLP (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kayla D. Phillips (Binkley, Andrew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from this action. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr recused. (Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings) Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/18/2020. (kc) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#12

No Description Available

11 #1

Attachment Business Entity Disclosure for Alcon Vision

10 #11

Exhibit EXHIBIT 11 - FDA Guidance

10 #8

Exhibit EXHIBIT 8 - 2017 Case Clearance

10 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 - EMW Women_s Surgical Ctr., P.S.C. v. Friedlander

10 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - Clear Care Plus Label

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#5

(#13) ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Osterfeld is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 11/11/20. (vk) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 1:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C CSC Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC from Cumberland County Circuit Court, case number CC1-20-CV-6631. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3246912) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Docket, #4 Exhibit C CSC Service, #5 Exhibit D Jury Verdict Report, and #6 Exhibit E Notice of Filing Removal)(kc) Modified on 11/2/2020 (kc). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated per NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal #20 by Kayla D. Phillips. No Order to enter.*** (bs) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kayla D. Phillips (Binkley, Andrew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN and the initial case management conference scheduled before her on 1/4/2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/19/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Savage Davidson admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from this action. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr recused. (Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings) Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/18/2020. (kc) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Savage Davidson on behalf of Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Alcon Vision, LLC (Davidson, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: On November 12, 2020, Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #15 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Chief Judge Crenshaw unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Alcon Vision, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #6 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taylor Arana is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 11/11/20. (vk) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Osterfeld is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 11/11/20. (vk) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketIL State Bar status verified as active for Gregory Ostfeld and Taylor Arana not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (vh) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Taylor Arana to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3249231) by Alcon Laboratories, Inc.. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Gregory Osterfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3249220) by Alcon Laboratories, Inc.. (Molloy, Catherine) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTN and FL State Bar status verified as active for Catherine H. Molloy admitted to this court. (kc) Modified on 11/2/2020 (kc). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew R. Binkley admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Gregory Ostfeld and Taylor Arana: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/23/2020. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 1:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC from Cumberland County Circuit Court, case number CC1-20-CV-6631. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3246912) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Docket, #4 Exhibit C CSC Service, #5 Exhibit D Jury Verdict Report, and #6 Exhibit E Notice of Filing Removal)(kc) Modified on 11/2/2020 (kc). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcon Vision, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Savage Davidson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine H. Molloy