This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2020 at 07:30:45 (UTC).

Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited et al v. Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited filed an Other lawsuit against Petroleos de Venezuela, S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00342

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V.

Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited

Respondents

PDVSA Petroleos, S.A.

Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.

Corpoguanipa, S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Garrett B. Moritz

Attorney at Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

100 S. West Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Anne M. Steadman

Attorney at Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

100 S. West Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael S. Kim

Josef M. Klazen

Marcus J. Green

Respondent Attorneys

Kevin A. Meehan

Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Aaron M. Nelson

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph D. Pizzurro

 

Court Documents

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

#13

#9

4 #6

Exhibit 6

4 #5

Exhibit 5

4 #4

Exhibit 4

4 #3

Exhibit 3

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

2 #2

Cover Letter

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

1 #1

Certified Judgement

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION re #13 Reply Brief by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Steadman, Anne) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Steadman, Anne) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Corpoguanipa, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/20. (ntl) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin A. Meehan, Joseph D. Pizzurro for PDVSA Petroleos, S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro and Kevin A. Meehan of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/2020. (ntl) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION re #11 MEMORANDUM in Support,,, Declaration of Kevin A. Meehan by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin A. Meehan, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin A. Meehan)(Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias, #3 Opening Brief in Support, #9 MOTION for Scheduling Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias Memorandum of Law of Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A. Corpoguanipa, S.A. and PDVSA Petroleo, S.A. In Support of Their Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in Opposition to Motion of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezula Limited and Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V.'s For Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/21/2020. (Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph D. Pizzurro and Kevin A. Meehan of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP - filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Michael S. Kim, Marcus J. Green, and Josef M. Klazen for ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. and Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Scheduling Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias - filed by Corpoguanipa, S.A., PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Scheduling Order Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias - filed by PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order to Motion to Set Briefing Schedule)(Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Nelson on behalf of PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Nelson, Aaron) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II on behalf of PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. (Hirzel, Samuel) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Kim, Marcus J. Green, and Josef M. Klazen - filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Moritz, Garrett) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (sam) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION in support re #2 MOTION Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(sam) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #2 MOTION Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment Fieri Facias. filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2019. (sam) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Writ of Fieri Facias - filed by ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter)(sam) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment in Favor of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, and ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. and Against Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., PDVSA Petroleos, S.A., and Corpoguanipa, S.A. in the Amount of $1,271,076,739.34 ( Filing fee $ 47, receipt number DEX032711) - filed by Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. (Attachments: #1 Certified Judgement)(sam) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne M. Steadman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Johnson Green

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Sangyun Kim